Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1637
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3788
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3581
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1119
|
Journal Page: 3581
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3581
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3581
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3561
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3561
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 845
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 845
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|