E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4993
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1607
|
Journal Page: 4993
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4993
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4993
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2409
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2409
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2409
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4755
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4755
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4755
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4574
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1960
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1960
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1960
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1960
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1960
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1960
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1960
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1555
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#941
|
Journal Page: 3160
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3160
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3160
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3055
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Guerra
|
Journal Page: 3055
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3055
|
House
|
05/09/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#686
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|