Senate | 05/21/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1349 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2676 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2486 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Record vote | RV#594 | Journal Page: 2486 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2486 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2486 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2406 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Record vote | RV#572 | Journal Page: 2405 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2405 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Amended | 3-Longoria | Journal Page: 2405 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2405 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Postponed | 5/4/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2088 |
House | 04/29/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2088 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Postponed | 4/29/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1909 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1909 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1632 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 848 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 848 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |