E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3616
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5782
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1780
|
Journal Page: 5781
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5780
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3423
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5568
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5568
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2566
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2566
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2566
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4854
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4854
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4854
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4854
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4574
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2023
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2023
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2023
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2022
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2484
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#592
|
Journal Page: 2484
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2484
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2484
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 849
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 849
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|