Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3535 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Collier, Alvarado, Bernal H.B. No. 3535
 (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 21, 2015, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 1; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3535 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to low income housing tax credits awarded for certain
 developments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2306.6711, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  Except as necessary to comply with the nonprofit
 set-aside required by Section 42(h)(5), Internal Revenue Code of
 1986 (26 U.S.C. Section 42(h)(5)), in an urban subregion of a
 uniform state service region that contains a county with a
 population of more than 1,700,000, the board shall allocate housing
 tax credits to:
 (1)  the highest scoring development, if any, that is
 part of a concerted plan of revitalization and is located in that
 urban subregion in a municipality with a population of 500,000 or
 more; and
 (2)  the highest scoring development, if any, that is
 located in the census tract with the lowest percentage of poverty in
 that urban subregion, as determined by the department.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to the allocation of low income housing tax credits for an
 application cycle that begins on or after January 1, 2017. The
 allocation of low income housing tax credits for an application
 cycle that begins before January 1, 2017, is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the application cycle began, and the former law
 is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *