Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3535 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3535


 AN ACT
 relating to low income housing tax credits awarded for certain
 developments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2306.6711, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  Except as necessary to comply with the nonprofit
 set-aside required by Section 42(h)(5), Internal Revenue Code of
 1986 (26 U.S.C. Section 42(h)(5)), in an urban subregion of a
 uniform state service region that contains a county with a
 population of more than 1.7 million, the board shall allocate
 housing tax credits to the highest scoring development, if any,
 that is part of a concerted plan of revitalization and is located in
 that urban subregion in a municipality with a population of 500,000
 or more.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to the allocation of low income housing tax credits for an
 application cycle that begins on or after January 1, 2017. The
 allocation of low income housing tax credits for an application
 cycle that begins before January 1, 2017, is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the application cycle began, and the former law
 is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3535 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 130, Nays 15, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3535 on May 27, 2015, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3535 on May 31, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 79,
 Nays 63, 3 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3535 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 19, Nays
 11; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3535 on May 30, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 23, Nays 8.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor