Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3536 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Landgraf (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 3536
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment of the commissioners of certain
 financial regulatory agencies by the Finance Commission of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.101(a), Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The banking commissioner is the chief executive officer
 of the Texas Department of Banking. The finance commission[, by at
 least five affirmative votes,] shall appoint the banking
 commissioner. The banking commissioner serves at the will of the
 finance commission and is subject to the finance commission's
 orders and directions.
 SECTION 2.  Section 13.002(a), Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The savings and mortgage lending commissioner is the
 chief executive officer of the Department of Savings and Mortgage
 Lending.  The finance commission[, by at least five affirmative
 votes,] shall appoint the savings and mortgage lending
 commissioner.  The savings and mortgage lending commissioner
 serves at the will of the finance commission and is subject to the
 finance commission's orders and direction.
 SECTION 3.  (a) The change in law made by this Act to Section
 12.101(a), Finance Code, applies only to the appointment of the
 banking commissioner on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 banking commissioner appointed before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law as it existed immediately before that
 date, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  The change in law made by this Act to Section 13.002(a),
 Finance Code, applies only to the appointment of the savings and
 mortgage lending commissioner on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A savings and mortgage lending commissioner appointed
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law as it
 existed immediately before that date, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *