E
|
06/15/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4335
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4001
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1276
|
Journal Page: 4001
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4001
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3906
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1546
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1158
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1158
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1102
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1851
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#341
|
Journal Page: 1851
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1851
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1851
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1841
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1841
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 895
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 895
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|