Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3547 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Larson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 3547
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 21, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 CampbellX
 BurtonX
 BirdwellX
 GarciaX
 HallX
 LucioX
 RodríguezX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a voluntary veteran's employment preference for private
 employers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 2, Labor Code, is amended by
 adding Chapter 23 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 23. VOLUNTARY VETERAN'S EMPLOYMENT PREFERENCE FOR PRIVATE
 EMPLOYERS
 Sec. 23.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "veteran" means
 an individual who:
 (1)  has served on active duty in the armed forces of
 the United States; and
 (2)  was honorably discharged from military service.
 Sec. 23.002.  VOLUNTARY PREFERENCE POLICY. (a) A private
 employer may adopt a policy under which the employer may give a
 preference in employment decisions regarding hiring, promotion, or
 retention to a veteran over another qualified applicant or
 employee.
 (b)  A policy adopted under this section must be in writing.
 Sec. 23.003.  APPLICATION OF POLICY. (a) A private employer
 shall apply any policy adopted under this chapter reasonably and in
 good faith in employment decisions regarding hiring, promotion, or
 retention during a reduction in the employer's workforce.
 (b)  A private employer may require appropriate
 documentation from a veteran for the veteran to be eligible for the
 preference under a policy adopted under this chapter.
 (c)  Granting a preference in accordance with a policy
 adopted under this chapter does not violate Chapter 21.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an employment decision made on or after the effective date of
 this Act. An employment decision made before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the decision
 was made, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *