LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB3576
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB3576
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3576
Compare Versions
HB3576 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3576 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3576 Enrolled May 29, 2015
HB3576 Comm Sub May 24, 2015
HB3576 Engrossed May 11, 2015
HB3576 Comm Sub April 28, 2015
HB3576 Introduced March 12, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB3576 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3576 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3576 Enrolled May 29, 2015
HB3576 Comm Sub May 24, 2015
HB3576 Engrossed May 11, 2015
HB3576 Comm Sub April 28, 2015
HB3576 Introduced March 12, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare