1 | 1 | | By: Howard, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 3577 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher |
---|
4 | 4 | | Education; May 21, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
5 | 5 | | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; |
---|
6 | 6 | | May 21, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | 8 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3577 By: Seliger |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 13 | | relating to the allocation of funds to eligible institutions under |
---|
14 | 14 | | the Texas Educational Opportunity Grant Program. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 56.403, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
17 | 17 | | adding Subsection (e) to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (e) The coordinating board shall consult with |
---|
19 | 19 | | representatives of eligible institutions to determine the |
---|
20 | 20 | | percentage of the total amount available for initial grants under |
---|
21 | 21 | | the program to be allocated to each type of eligible institution for |
---|
22 | 22 | | the distribution of initial grants under the program. If the |
---|
23 | 23 | | representatives cannot reach a unanimous consensus on the |
---|
24 | 24 | | percentage for each allocation, the coordinating board shall |
---|
25 | 25 | | allocate 92 percent of the total amount available for initial |
---|
26 | 26 | | grants under the program to public junior colleges and allocate the |
---|
27 | 27 | | remaining amount to other eligible institutions. This subsection |
---|
28 | 28 | | expires August 31, 2018. |
---|
29 | 29 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies to the |
---|
30 | 30 | | allocations to eligible institutions under Subchapter P, Chapter |
---|
31 | 31 | | 56, Education Code, as amended by this Act, beginning with the |
---|
32 | 32 | | 2015-2016 academic year. |
---|
33 | 33 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
34 | 34 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
35 | 35 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
36 | 36 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
37 | 37 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
38 | 38 | | * * * * * |
---|