Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3610 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2015

                    By: Collier (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 3610
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 19, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3610 By:  Huffines


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of Texas Juneteenth specialty license
 plates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.649 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.649.  TEXAS JUNETEENTH LICENSE PLATES.  (a)  The
 department shall issue Texas Juneteenth specialty license plates.
 The department shall design the license plates in consultation with
 Unity Unlimited Inc.
 (b)  After deduction of the department's administrative
 costs, the remainder of the fee for issuance of the license plates
 shall be deposited to the credit of the general revenue fund to be
 used only by the Texas Historical Commission in making grants to
 Unity Unlimited Inc. for the purpose of promoting the celebration
 of Juneteenth in this state, provided that verification is
 submitted to the Texas Historical Commission demonstrating that
 Unity Unlimited Inc. continues to maintain its nonprofit status.
 If Unity Unlimited Inc. does not have nonprofit status at the time
 of the distribution of a grant, the grant shall be distributed to
 another nonprofit organization for the purpose of promoting the
 celebration of Juneteenth in this state.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *