LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB3610
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB3610
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3610
Compare Versions
HB3610 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3610 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3610 Enrolled May 26, 2015
HB3610 Comm Sub May 19, 2015
HB3610 Engrossed May 6, 2015
HB3610 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB3610 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3610 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3610 Enrolled May 26, 2015
HB3610 Comm Sub May 19, 2015
HB3610 Engrossed May 6, 2015
HB3610 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare