Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3623 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Gonzales (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3623
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 20, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of property
 owned by the National Hispanic Institute.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.23, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (m) to read as follows:
 (m)  National Hispanic Institute. The National Hispanic
 Institute is entitled to an exemption from taxation of the real and
 tangible personal property it owns as long as the organization is
 exempt from federal income taxation under Section 501(a), Internal
 Revenue Code of 1986, as an organization described by Section
 501(c)(3) of that code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.43(c), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (c)  An exemption provided by Section 11.13, 11.131, 11.132,
 11.17, 11.18, 11.182, 11.1827, 11.183, 11.19, 11.20, 11.21, 11.22,
 11.23(h), (j), [or] (j-1), or (m), 11.231, 11.254, 11.271, 11.29,
 11.30, 11.31, or 11.315, once allowed, need not be claimed in
 subsequent years, and except as otherwise provided by Subsection
 (e), the exemption applies to the property until it changes
 ownership or the person's qualification for the exemption
 changes.  However, the chief appraiser may require a person allowed
 one of the exemptions in a prior year to file a new application to
 confirm the person's current qualification for the exemption by
 delivering a written notice that a new application is required,
 accompanied by an appropriate application form, to the person
 previously allowed the exemption.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies only to an ad valorem tax year
 that begins on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *