E | 05/28/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/28/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5572 | |
E | 05/20/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4088 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1715 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3785 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3846 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3574 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1622 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1622 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1622 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1622 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1622 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1622 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1622 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1612 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1582 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1467 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#758 | Journal Page: 2841 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2841 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2841 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2823 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2823 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 884 | |
House | 03/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 884 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |