Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3629 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Raney (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 3629
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources and Economic Development; May 22, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 22, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to use and allocation of municipal hotel occupancy tax
 revenues for certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 351.101, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  In addition to the purposes provided by Subsection (a),
 a municipality that has a population of at least 75,000 but not more
 than 95,000 and that is located in a county that has a population of
 more than 160,000 but less than 200,000 may use revenue from the
 municipal hotel tax to promote tourism and the convention and hotel
 industry by constructing, operating, or expanding a sporting
 related facility or sports field owned by the municipality, if the
 majority of the events at the facility or field are directly related
 to a sporting event in which the majority of participants are
 tourists who substantially increase economic activity at hotels in
 the municipality.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 351, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 351.1078 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.1078.  ALLOCATION OF REVENUE:  CERTAIN
 MUNICIPALITIES.  (a)  A municipality that spends municipal hotel
 occupancy tax revenue as authorized by Section 351.101(i):
 (1)  may not use municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue
 for the acquisition of land for the sporting related facility or
 sports field described by that subsection;
 (2)  shall annually determine and prepare and publish
 on the municipality's Internet website a report on the events held
 at the facility or field, the number of hotel room nights
 attributable to events held at the facility or field, and the amount
 of hotel revenue and municipal tax revenue attributable to the
 sports events and tournaments held at the facility or field for five
 years after the date the construction expenditures are completed;
 and
 (3)  may only spend hotel occupancy tax revenue for
 operational expenses of the facility or field if the costs are
 directly related to a sporting event in which the majority of
 participants are tourists who substantially increase economic
 activity at hotels in or near the municipality.
 (b)  The municipality shall reimburse to the municipality's
 hotel occupancy tax revenue fund from the municipality's general
 fund any expenditure in excess of the amount of area hotel revenue
 attributable to sporting events held at the sporting related
 facility or sports field described by Section 351.101(i) for five
 years after the date the construction or expansion of the facility
 or field described by that subsection is completed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *