Senate | 05/21/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1197 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2074 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Record vote | RV#430 | Journal Page: 2074 |
House | 04/29/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2074 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2074 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2055 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2055 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2055 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1366 | |
House | 03/25/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 297 | |
House | 02/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 297 | |
House | 11/24/2014 | Filed |