Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3683 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 3683
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the electronic filing of personal financial statements
 with the Texas Ethics Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 572, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 572.0291 to read as follows:
 Sec. 572.0291.  ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIRED. A financial
 statement filed with the commission must be filed by computer
 diskette, modem, or other means of electronic transfer, using
 computer software provided by the commission or computer software
 that meets commission specifications for a standard file format.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *