House | 05/14/2015 | Postponed | 6/4/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3440 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3440 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Postponed | 5/14/15 12:00 PM | Journal Page: 2918 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2917 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Postponed | 5/8/15 1:30 PM | Journal Page: 2516 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2516 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Postponed | 5/5/15 1:30 PM | Journal Page: 2440 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2440 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Amended | 1-S. King | Journal Page: 2423 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2423 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 888 | |
House | 03/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 888 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Filed |