LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB372
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB372
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB372
Compare Versions
HB372 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB372 Engrossed February 1, 2025
HB372 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB372 Enrolled May 27, 2015
HB372 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB372 Comm Sub March 19, 2015
HB372 Introduced November 24, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
HB372 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB372 Engrossed February 1, 2025
HB372 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB372 Enrolled May 27, 2015
HB372 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB372 Comm Sub March 19, 2015
HB372 Introduced November 24, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare