Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3738 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Cyrier (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 3738
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 12, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that a person or laboratory that
 performs an official equine infectious anemia test be approved by
 the Texas Animal Health Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 161, Agriculture Code, is
 amended by adding Section 161.0602 to read as follows:
 Sec. 161.0602.  PERSONS OR LABORATORIES PERFORMING EQUINE
 INFECTIOUS ANEMIA TESTS. (a) The commission shall adopt rules that
 require a person or laboratory to be approved by the commission if
 the person or laboratory performs an official equine infectious
 anemia test.
 (b)  Rules adopted under this section must include:
 (1)  approval requirements;
 (2)  provisions governing the issuance, renewal, and
 revocation of an approval;
 (3)  inspection requirements;
 (4)  recordkeeping requirements;
 (5)  equine infectious anemia testing methods approved
 by the commission; and
 (6)  proficiency standards.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2015, the Texas Animal
 Health Commission shall adopt rules as required by Section
 161.0602, Agriculture Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *