1 | | - | By: Cyrier (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 3738 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015; |
---|
3 | | - | May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | | - | Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 12, 2015, reported |
---|
5 | | - | favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent |
---|
6 | | - | to printer.) |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 3738 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to the requirement that a person or laboratory that |
---|
12 | 6 | | performs an official equine infectious anemia test be approved by |
---|
13 | 7 | | the Texas Animal Health Commission. |
---|
14 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 161, Agriculture Code, is |
---|
16 | 10 | | amended by adding Section 161.0602 to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 11 | | Sec. 161.0602. PERSONS OR LABORATORIES PERFORMING EQUINE |
---|
18 | 12 | | INFECTIOUS ANEMIA TESTS. (a) The commission shall adopt rules that |
---|
19 | 13 | | require a person or laboratory to be approved by the commission if |
---|
20 | 14 | | the person or laboratory performs an official equine infectious |
---|
21 | 15 | | anemia test. |
---|
22 | 16 | | (b) Rules adopted under this section must include: |
---|
23 | 17 | | (1) approval requirements; |
---|
24 | 18 | | (2) provisions governing the issuance, renewal, and |
---|
25 | 19 | | revocation of an approval; |
---|
26 | 20 | | (3) inspection requirements; |
---|
27 | 21 | | (4) recordkeeping requirements; |
---|
28 | 22 | | (5) equine infectious anemia testing methods approved |
---|
29 | 23 | | by the commission; and |
---|
30 | 24 | | (6) proficiency standards. |
---|
31 | 25 | | SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2015, the Texas Animal |
---|
32 | 26 | | Health Commission shall adopt rules as required by Section |
---|
33 | 27 | | 161.0602, Agriculture Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
34 | 28 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
35 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 29 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 30 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 31 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 3738 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 32 | + | 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
| 33 | + | voting. |
---|
| 34 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 35 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 36 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 3738 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 37 | + | 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 38 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 39 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 40 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 41 | + | Date |
---|
| 42 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 43 | + | Governor |
---|