Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3742 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Smith (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 3742
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Licensing and
 Regulation to determine applicant eligibility for a license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 51, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.4041 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.4041.  ALTERNATIVE QUALIFICATIONS FOR LICENSE. (a)
 The commission, department, or executive director may adopt
 alternative means of determining or verifying a person's
 eligibility for a license issued by the department, including
 evaluating the person's education, training, experience, and
 military service.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, the commission or the
 executive director may waive any prerequisite for obtaining a
 license if the applicant currently holds a similar license issued
 by another jurisdiction that:
 (1)  has requirements for the license that are
 substantially equivalent to those of this state; or
 (2)  has a reciprocity agreement with this state for
 the license.
 (c)  The department, with approval of the governor, may enter
 into an agreement with another state to allow for licensing by
 reciprocity.
 SECTION 2.  Section 469.004, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 469.004.  APPLICABILITY OF OTHER LAW. Section 51.4041
 [51.404], Occupations Code, does not apply to this chapter.
 SECTION 3.  Section 754.025, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 754.025.  APPLICATION OF CERTAIN LAW.  Sections 51.401
 and 51.4041 [51.404], Occupations Code, do not apply to this
 chapter, except those sections do apply to Sections 754.017 and
 754.0171.
 SECTION 4.  Section 55.004(c), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  The executive director of a state agency may issue a
 license by endorsement in the same manner as the Texas Commission of
 Licensing and Regulation under Section 51.4041(b) [51.404] to an
 applicant described by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 5.  Section 1202.106, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1202.106.  APPLICABILITY OF OTHER LAW. Sections 51.401
 and 51.4041 [51.404] do not apply to this chapter.
 SECTION 6.  Section 51.404, Occupations Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 7.  Section 51.4041, Occupations Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to an application for a license submitted to
 the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An application for a license submitted
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the application was submitted, and the former law
 is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *