E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4976
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1631
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3788
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1143
|
Journal Page: 3611
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3611
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3611
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1093
|
Journal Page: 3506
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3506
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3506
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2451
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 975
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 975
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|