Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Tagged
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1615
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3417
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1074
|
Journal Page: 3417
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3417
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3416
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3334
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3334
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3334
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1045
|
Journal Page: 3334
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
6-Simpson
|
Journal Page: 3333
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Amended
|
5-J. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 3333
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
4-G. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 3333
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3333
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/12/15 11:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3260
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 3260
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2 and Rule 11, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 3260
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
4-G. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 3259
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Amended
|
3-G. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 3259
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-J. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 3259
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3259
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/11/15 7:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3035
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3035
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2451
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|