LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB39
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB39
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB39
Compare Versions
HB39 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB39 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB39 Enrolled May 19, 2015
HB39 Comm Sub May 7, 2015
HB39 Engrossed April 22, 2015
HB39 Introduced March 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB39 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB39 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB39 Enrolled May 19, 2015
HB39 Comm Sub May 7, 2015
HB39 Engrossed April 22, 2015
HB39 Introduced March 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare