Senate | 05/13/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1468 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2841 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#758 | Journal Page: 2841 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2841 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2841 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2823 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2823 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 926 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 926 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Filed |