Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1638
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3788
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3582
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1119
|
Journal Page: 3582
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3582
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3582
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3563
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3563
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3111
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Referred to Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|