Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1556
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#948
|
Journal Page: 3165
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3165
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3165
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
House
|
05/09/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#686
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Referred to Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 928
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 928
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|