E
|
06/12/2015
|
Effective on 1/1/16
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3642
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5385
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1703
|
Journal Page: 5385
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4812
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2086
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Perry
|
Journal Page: 2086
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2086
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2086
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA15 Watson
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2078
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2078
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Perry
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1943
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1846
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1785
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1786
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1675
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1622
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1622
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1615
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3429
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1077
|
Journal Page: 3429
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3429
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3428
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/14/15 11:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3415
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3415
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3400
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1068
|
Journal Page: 3400
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3400
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Amended
|
19-Krause
|
Journal Page: 3399
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 6
|
Journal Page: 3399
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
19-Krause
|
Journal Page: 3395
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
18-Leach
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
16-Walle
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
3-E. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 3381
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3374
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 932
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 932
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|