E
|
06/20/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/20/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4217
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1875
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1875
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1875
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1875
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1638
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3788
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1119
|
Journal Page: 3582
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3582
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3582
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3563
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3563
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 932
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 932
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|