E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4970
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5213
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4633
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4634
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1477
|
Journal Page: 4633
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4633
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1943
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1867
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1867
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1867
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1867
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1867
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1867
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Schwertner
|
Journal Page: 1865
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1865
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1865
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1625
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1103
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#357
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1816
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1816
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 932
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 932
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|