E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/26/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2290
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1967
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4317
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4318
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1373
|
Journal Page: 4317
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4317
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4111
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#592
|
Journal Page: 2484
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2484
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2484
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2469
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2469
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 932
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 932
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|