Senate | 05/21/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1468 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3112 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#780 | Journal Page: 2864 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2864 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2864 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2740 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2740 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2111 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 933 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 933 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Filed |