House | 05/08/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3111 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2104 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1435 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 935 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 935 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Filed |