E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5239
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1669
|
Journal Page: 5239
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5239
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4976
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1556
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3137
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#919
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3123
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3123
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|