Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB406 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/01/2014

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R2122 CAE-D
 By: González H.B. No. 406


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a task force to determine alternative
 methods of assessing the performance of public school students and
 school districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  TASK FORCE ON ALTERNATIVES TO STANDARDIZED
 TESTING. (a) A task force is established under this section to
 determine alternative methods of assessing the performance of
 public school students and school districts.
 (b)  The task force is composed of the following 42 members
 appointed by the commissioner of education:
 (1)  10 teachers who are certified in bilingual
 education with a minimum of three years' classroom experience, with
 appointment reflecting the geographic diversity of the state and
 including teachers from both rural and urban school districts;
 (2)  three teachers specializing in language arts with
 a minimum of three years' classroom experience;
 (3)  two teachers specializing in mathematics with a
 minimum of three years' classroom experience;
 (4)  five teachers with a minimum of three years'
 classroom experience;
 (5)  10 school administrators and school district
 central office administrators, with appointments reflecting the
 geographic diversity of the state; and
 (6)  12 members who are students, parents of students,
 or community members, including university professors and
 education policy researchers.
 (c)  The commissioner of education shall appoint the
 presiding officer of the task force.
 (d)  The commissioner of education shall appoint the members
 of the task force not later than December 1, 2015.
 (e)  The presiding officer shall call the initial meeting of
 the task force on or before January 1, 2016. The task force shall
 meet at the times and places that the presiding officer determines
 are appropriate. The task force shall adopt rules necessary to
 fulfill the task force's duties under this section.
 (f)  Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 task force.
 SECTION 2.  DUTIES OF TASK FORCE. The task force shall
 evaluate alternative methods of measuring accountability to
 replace standardized testing of students. The task force shall:
 (1)  determine alternative methods of measuring
 accountability using multiple forms of evidence of student learning
 and student growth, with information about student learning and
 student growth obtained at the beginning, middle, and end of each
 school year;
 (2)  develop an accountability measure that informs
 teachers of the progress of students and provides real-time
 diagnostic information to be used by the teacher;
 (3)  recommend a method of accountability that provides
 assistance to teachers that is locally derived and reflects the
 needs of the local district; and
 (4)  develop a system that is easy to incorporate and
 streamline into curriculum and provides minimal disruption and
 interruption to student learning.
 SECTION 3.  REPORT. Not later than February 1, 2018, the
 task force shall deliver a report to the commissioner of education
 detailing the task force's findings and recommendations. The
 report shall be made available on the Texas Education Agency's
 Internet website.
 SECTION 4.  EXPIRATION.  The task force is abolished and this
 Act expires March 1, 2018.
 SECTION 5.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect September
 1, 2015.