Senate | 05/13/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1468 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2868 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#782 | Journal Page: 2867 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2867 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Amended | 1-Simpson, et al. | Journal Page: 2867 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Motion to table fails | 1-Simpson | Journal Page: 2866 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Simpson, Schaefer, Blanco, Murphy, Y. Davis, Anchia, and Rinaldi | Journal Page: 2865 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#735 | Journal Page: 2751 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Amended | 5-Rinaldi | Journal Page: 2749 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Motion to table fails | 5-Rinaldi | Journal Page: 2748 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | 5-Rinaldi | Journal Page: 2746 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Amendment tabled | 4-Schaefer | Journal Page: 2743 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Rinaldi | Journal Page: 2741 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2741 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 936 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 936 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Filed |