House | 04/27/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2001 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Record vote | RV#397 | Journal Page: 2000 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 2000 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Amended | 1-C. Turner | Journal Page: 2000 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(4) and Rule 8, Section 1(c) | Journal Page: 1999 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1998 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Postponed | 4/27/15 3:15 PM | Journal Page: 1989 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1989 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1745 | |
House | 04/06/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/16/2015 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 332 | |
House | 02/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 332 | |
House | 12/01/2014 | Filed |