E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4970
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5213
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4612
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1470
|
Journal Page: 4612
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4612
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4342
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1510
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2990
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#859
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2958
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Amended
|
2-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 2957
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2957
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 938
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 938
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|