Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4103 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/23/2015

                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Garcia) H.B. No. 4103
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to oaths and affirmations of certain judges of municipal
 courts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 29.005, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 29.005.  TERM OF OFFICE. (a) The judge of a municipal
 court serves for a term of office of two years unless the
 municipality provides for a longer term pursuant to Section 11,
 Article XI, [Section 11, of the] Texas Constitution.
 (b)  A municipal court judge who is not reappointed by the
 91st day following the expiration of a term of office shall, absent
 action by the appointing authority, continue to serve for another
 term of office beginning on the date the previous term of office
 expired.
 (c)  A judge of a municipal court who continues to serve for
 another term of office under Subsection (b) may continue to perform
 the duties of the office without taking an additional oath or
 affirmation required under Section 1, Article XVI, Texas
 Constitution.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to a
 judge of a municipal court who serves in the office before, on, or
 after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *