Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4112 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Burns, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 4112
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 19, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 19, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the rights of an owner of groundwater.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 36.002, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  The groundwater ownership and rights described by this
 section[:
 [(1)]  entitle the landowner, including a landowner's
 lessees, heirs, or assigns, to:
 (1)  drill for and produce the groundwater below the
 surface of real property, subject to Subsection (d), without
 causing waste or malicious drainage of other property or
 negligently causing subsidence; and
 (2)  have any other right recognized under common law.
 (b-1)  The groundwater ownership and rights described by
 this section do [, but does] not:
 (1)  entitle a landowner, including a landowner's
 lessees, heirs, or assigns, to the right to capture a specific
 amount of groundwater below the surface of that landowner's land;
 or [and]
 (2)  [do not] affect the existence of common law
 defenses or other defenses to liability under the rule of capture.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *