E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3106
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5213
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4773
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1261
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2344
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#448
|
Journal Page: 2151
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2151
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2151
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2133
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2133
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1551
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|