E
|
06/15/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4111
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1501
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1501
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1468
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2869
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#783
|
Journal Page: 2868
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2868
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2868
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|