House | 05/08/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2965 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 2064 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 04/02/2015 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Filed |