E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2852
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5073
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1633
|
Journal Page: 5074
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5073
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4812
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2380
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1941
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1818
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1818
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1198
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3791
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Bell
|
Journal Page: 3791
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3791
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 1489
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1489
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|