House | 05/08/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3112 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1707 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 1490 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1490 | |
House | 04/06/2015 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Filed |