Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1468
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2842
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#758
|
Journal Page: 2842
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2842
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2842
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2829
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2829
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|