House | 05/13/2015 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 3548 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1939 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1939 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Filed |