E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4978
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2437
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2437
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2437
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2437
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2437
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2437
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2437
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1941
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1818
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1818
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1737
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1198
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|